Tanaka, Toshihiro (CPSO#: 83721)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Tsukuba Daigaku Igaku, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2005 to 21 Nov 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Clinical Pharmacology & Toxicology

University of Toronto, 22 Nov 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Clinical Pharmacology & Toxicology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Clinical Pharmacology & Toxicology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Clinical Pharmacology & Toxicology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Clinical Pharmacology & Toxicology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009