Tandan, Pamela Janet (CPSO#: 19785)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Leeds, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 02 Dec 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 1966
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 May 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008