Tandan, Tara Cinnamon Aruna (CPSO#: 74592)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Aug 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Aug 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McMaster University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 10 Apr 2000 to 30 Apr 2000
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Aug 2003