Tandan, Ved Raoul (CPSO#: 60813)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Hospital & Cancer Centre
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 43919
Fax: (905) 381-7053
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ved Tandan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 11 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Tandan ( CPSO# 60813 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 05 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VED RAOUL TANDAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANDAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Mar 1995
Resident 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1990