Tandon, Naveen (CPSO#: 79762)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Sep 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Naveen Tandon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 6 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: Franklin Medical Centre 1150 Franklin Boulevard Cambridge ON N1R 7J2 Tel: 519-620-7044 Fax: 519-620-3050 Patients should call Service Ontario at 1 888 218 9929 and verify the name of the physician that they are rostered to if Franklin Medical Centre does not have the patients medical records. Once determined, the patient should then contact that physician for access to records. NOTE: Patients who saw Dr. Tandon at the Cambridge Medical Centre can request a copy of their record directly from the clinic.
Date Received: 10 Nov 2014

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAVEEN TANDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANDON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 05 Oct 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 06 Oct 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 04 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 05 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 15 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 16 Sep 2009 to 15 Apr 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2010