Tandon, Vikas (CPSO#: 82290)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Healthcare Hamilton
Fontbonne Building
5th Floor Room F543
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 31378
Fax: (905) 521-6068
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vikas Tandon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 27 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Tandon ( CPSO# 82290 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Fontbonne Building
5th Floor Room F543
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 18 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIKAS TANDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANDON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 11 Apr 2005 to 06 May 2005
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 19 Nov 2007 to 14 Dec 2007
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 05 Sep 2008
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 May 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2009