Tang, Anthony Sze-Leung (CPSO#: 30099)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Oct 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Oct 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
Room C6 109
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3746
Fax: (519) 663-3782
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anthony Tang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 23 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Tang ( CPSO# 30099 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
Room C6-109
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3746

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 02 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTHONY SZE-LEUNG TANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jul 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2013