Tang, Bao Quy (CPSO#: 71170)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 230
1555 McKenzie Avenue
Victoria BC  V8N 1A4
Phone: (250) 220-8932
Fax: (250) 220-8926

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BAO QUY TANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002