Tang, Bonnie (CPSO#: 100211)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 309
1580 Merivale Road
Nepean ON  K2G 4B5
Phone: (613) 226-4030
Fax: (613) 225-3891
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Health and Counselling Services
Carleton University
1125 Colonel By Drive
Ottawa ON  K1S5B6
Canada
Phone: 613-520-6674
Fax: 613-520-4059
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BONNIE TANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015