Tang, Christine Elizabeth (CPSO#: 54400)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-4466
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C.E. Tang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Tang ( CPSO# 54400 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-4466

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE ELIZABETH TANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1984