Tang, Christine Louise (CPSO#: 66951)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
135 Queen's Plate Drive
Suite 340
Toronto ON  M9W 6V1
Phone: (416) 740-0428
Fax: (416) 740-3490
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christine L. Tang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 13 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Tang ( CPSO# 66951 )

Business Address:
340 - 135 Queens Plate Drive
Toronto ON  M9W 6V1
Phone Number: (416) 740-2483

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE LOUISE TANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 04 Jan 1999
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1998