Tang, Gilbert (CPSO#: 77990)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 31 Dec 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2010