Tang, Godwin Pok Yin (CPSO#: 69263)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 8
360 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3Y7
Phone: (905) 881-0900
Fax: (905) 881-0906
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 5-6
9019 Bayview Avenue
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3M6
Canada
Phone: (905) 886-1110
Fax: (905) 886-9996
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Choy & Tang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 12 2013


Corporation Name: Godwin Tang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 18 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Tang ( CPSO# 69263 )

Business Address:
Unit 8
360 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3Y7
Phone Number: (905) 881-0900

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GODWIN POK YIN TANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1997