Tang, Gordon Lok-Sang (CPSO#: 65018)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Midland Eglinton Medical Clinic
Unit 10
2480 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1K 2R4
Phone: (416) 266-1818
Fax: (416) 266-0800
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gordon Tang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 26 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Tang ( CPSO# 65018 )

Business Address:
Midland Eglinton Medical Clinic
Unit 10
2480 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1K 2R4
Phone Number: (416) 266-1818

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GORDON LOK-SANG TANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1993