Tang, Patricia (CPSO#: 77131)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Dec 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Dec 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 22 Oct 2001 to 18 Nov 2001
Elective Trainee - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 15 Dec 2006
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Nov 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Dec 2006