Tang, Shou-Ching (CPSO#: 67069)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:West China Medical University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 05 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jun 1997