Tang, Siu Wa (CPSO#: 28876)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Dec 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Dec 1976

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Of California- Irvine
North Campus- Psychiatry
Irvine CA  96297-1681
United States
Phone: (949) 824-3557

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R
USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 09 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIU WA TANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 1976