Tang, Timothy Kwong Kai (CPSO#: 62945)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 03 Oct 1991

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 06 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Oct 1991