Tangri, Vikram (CPSO#: 88373)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Court Medical Centre
5 Quarry Ridge Road
Suite 308
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone: (705) 797-1475
Fax: (705) 797-1476
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Royal Victoria Regional Health Ctr
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M3
Canada
Phone: (705) 729-9092
Fax: (705) 728-3039
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vikram Tangri Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 09 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Tangri ( CPSO# 88373 )

Business Address:
Royal Court Medical Centre
5 Quarry Ridge Road
Suite 308
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 797-1475

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M3
Phone Number: (705) 728-3039

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 22 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIKRAM TANGRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANGRI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2012