Tanguay, Alain Georges (CPSO#: 63491)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 03 Dec 1996 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 May 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2009