Tangwiwat, Suwimon (CPSO#: 82093)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Prince of Songkla University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 10 Feb 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 11 Feb 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006