Tanna, Nirupam Manilal (CPSO#: 54959)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Oct 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Oct 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Bombay, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 The Queensway
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B6
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. N. Tanna Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 14 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Tanna ( CPSO# 54959 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B6
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
247 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 277-3045

Business Address:
470 Chrysler Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 6G3
Phone Number: (905) 790-9030

Business Address:
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 259-6671

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 23 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NIRUPAM MANILAL TANNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANNA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 1985