Tanna, Shital (CPSO#: 68290)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Aug 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Aug 1999

Summary

Former Name: Ruparelia, Shital (used until: 02 Dec 1996 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Aug 1999