Tanner, Keith Lang (CPSO#: 66867)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesia
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room M3-200
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4864
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Keith Tanner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 01 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Tanner ( CPSO# 66867 )

Business Address:
43 Wellesley Street East
Toronto ON  M4Y 1H1
Phone Number: (416) 967-8500

Business Address:
Department of Anaesthesia
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room 3M-200
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEITH LANG TANNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANNER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998