Tanner, Wayne Royden (CPSO#: 26131)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Dec 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Dec 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 26 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WAYNE ROYDEN TANNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANNER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Aug 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 1989