Tannous, Rosemonde Eugene (CPSO#: 43588)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:Ain Shams University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 204
4256 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6A4
Phone: (905) 354-1895
Fax: (905) 354-5097
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tannous Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Tannous ( CPSO# 43588 )

Business Address:
204 - 4256 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6A4
Phone Number: (905) 354-1895

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 01 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROSEMONDE EUGENE TANNOUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANNOUS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1986