Tanser, Paul Harry (CPSO#: 27302)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 May 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 May 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1966
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 May 2007