Tanswell, Alan Keith (CPSO#: 30662)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Mar 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Mar 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 16 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Mar 2014