Tanton, Robert Lewis (CPSO#: 62711)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
49 High Street
Barrie ON  L4N 5J4
Phone: (705) 728-5780
Fax: (705) 728-8371
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Tanton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Tanton ( CPSO# 62711 )

Business Address:
Suite 101
49 High Street
Barrie ON  L4N 5J4
Phone Number: (705) 728-5780

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT LEWIS TANTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANTON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1991