Tao, Liang-Che (CPSO#: 41871)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:Peking Union Medical University, 1954

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 17 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 1973
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1994