Tao, Ren Zhu (CPSO#: 106969)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Aug 2017

Expiry Date:  16 Aug 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 17 Aug 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4789 Yonge Street
North York ON  M2N 0G3
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1871 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 1J3
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Aug 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Aug 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Aug 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Ren  Zhu  Tao  may practise family medicine at 4789 Yonge Street and
                  1871  Danforth  Avenue  in  Toronto,  Ontario,  while  under  supervision
                  coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The certificate of  registration  automatically  expires three years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Tao's eligibility to take the College of
                  Family Physicians of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires  upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate  with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding  Dr.
                        Tao's  knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the
                        required  reports  to the College by the due date or if the reports
                        are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Tao's practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued  on  August  17,  2017,  and will expire on or
                  before August 16, 2020, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.