Tao, Tina Maria May Lun (CPSO#: 66743)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 708
1243 Islington Avenue
Toronto ON  M8X 1Y9
Phone: (416) 922-6897
Fax: (416) 944-8432
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

625 Runnymede Road
Toronto ON  M6S 3A3
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tao Smolkin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Tao ( CPSO# 66743 )
Dr. M. Smolkin ( CPSO# 63693 )

Business Address:
625 Runnymade Road
Toronto ON  M6S 3A3

Business Address:
708 - 1243 Islington Avenue
Toronto ON  M8X 1Y9
Phone Number: (416) 922-6897

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Runnymede Healthcare Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TINA MARIA MAY LUN TAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998