Taqi, Salah (CPSO#: 78133)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Leeds, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 04 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 06 Aug 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 07 Aug 2003 to 04 Sep 2003
PEAP - Resident - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 05 Sep 2003 to 04 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 05 Sep 2004 to 04 Sep 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 05 Sep 2005 to 04 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 05 Sep 2006 to 04 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 05 Sep 2007 to 04 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 05 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009