Taraska, Victoria Kimberley (CPSO#: 65057)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Sep 2011