Tarek-Kaminker, Richard Stephen (CPSO#: 66622)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: Kaminker, Richard Stephen (used until: 03 Apr 2007 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202 The Court
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 5E9
Phone: (416) 287-2335
Fax: 4162877991
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Richard Tarek-Kaminker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 30 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Tarek-Kaminker ( CPSO# 66622 )

Business Address:
202 - 2863 Ellesmere Road
The Court
Scarborough ON  M1E 5E9
Phone Number: (416) 287-2335

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD STEPHEN TAREK-KAMINKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAREK-KAMINKER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000