Tarman, Vera Ingrid (CPSO#: 65160)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
24 Monteith Street
Toronto ON  M4Y 1K7
Phone: (416) 323-3660
Fax: (416) 323-4778
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

78 Admiral Road
Toronto ON  M5R 2L6
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

38 Isabella Street
Toronto ON  M4Y 1N1
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vera Ingrid Tarman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Tarman ( CPSO# 65160 )

Business Address:
24 Monteith Street
Toronto ON  M4Y 1K7
Phone Number: (416) 323-3660

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VERA INGRID TARMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TARMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993