Tarnopolsky, Mark Andrew (CPSO#: 60442)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Depts of Pediatrics and Medicine
McMaster University Medical Centre
H S C 2H26
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75226
Fax: (905) 577-8380
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark Tarnopolsky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tarnopolsky ( CPSO# 60442 )

Business Address:
Depts of Pediatrics and Medicine
McMaster University Medical Centre
H S C 2H26
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK ANDREW TARNOPOLSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TARNOPOLSKY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Dec 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Oct 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1992