Tarrant, Gary Milton (CPSO#: 77393)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 26 Aug 2002 to 31 Jul 2003
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2009