Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Tarshis, Jordan Craig (CPSO#: 63510)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4864
Fax: (416) 480-6039
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kensington Screening Clinic
340 College Street, Suite 601
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Canada
Phone: (416) 928-9511
Fax: (416) 928-9513
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Institute of Cosmetic Surgery
31 Alvin Avenue
Toronto ON  M4T 2A7
Canada
Phone: 416-926-8122
Fax: 416-926-8841
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jordan Tarshis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 01 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Tarshis ( CPSO# 63510 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
2075 Bayview Avenue
Suite 3M-200
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Business Address:
Suite 601
340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 928-9511

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 12 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JORDAN CRAIG TARSHIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TARSHIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1992