Tarshis, Lorne Marvin (CPSO#: 24722)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Nov 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Nov 1975

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Institute of Cosmetic Surgery
31 Alvin Avenue
Toronto ON  M4T 2A7
Phone: (416) 926-8122
Fax: (416) 926-8841
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lorne M. Tarshis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 01 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Tarshis ( CPSO# 24722 )

Business Address:
Institute of Cosmetic Surgery
31 Alvin Avenue
Toronto ON  M4T 2A7
Phone Number: (416) 926-8122

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 25 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LORNE MARVIN TARSHIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TARSHIS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1972
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Sep 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 1975

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: November 9, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.


NOTE: This decision has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.
Download Full Document (PDF)