Tarshis, Wendy Lisa (CPSO#: 60862)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 703
240 Duncan Mill Road
Toronto ON  M3B 3S6
Phone: (416) 494-7396
Fax: (416) 494-0129
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WENDY LISA TARSHIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TARSHIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1990