Tartaglia, Maria Carmela (CPSO#: 79323)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Mar 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Mar 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:McGill University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto
Division of Neurology
Room 5WW 449
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5483
Fax: (416) 603-5768
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ontario Shores
Centre for Mental Health
700 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5S9
Canada
Phone: (905) 430-4055
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tartaglia Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 16 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tartaglia ( CPSO# 79323 )

Business Address:
Suite 5-449, West Wing
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5483

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIA CARMELA TARTAGLIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TARTAGLIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2011