Tasca, Giordano (CPSO#: 85880)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Milan, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2007 to 21 Mar 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 22 Mar 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2007