Tashkandi, Abdulaziz Mohammed Saeed (CPSO#: 97299)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Feb 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Feb 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Umm Al Qura University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2012 to 16 May 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 17 May 2012 to 16 May 2013
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 17 May 2013 to 16 May 2014
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 17 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Feb 2015
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 May 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2015