Tatla, Raman Kaur (CPSO#: 103693)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
Division of Primary Care
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Low-Risk Obstetrics Clinic
3024 Hurontario Street, Suite 312
Mississauga ON  L5B 4M4
Canada
Phone: (905) 232-5006
Fax: (905) 232-8004
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Streetsville Medical Centre
5425 Creditview Road, Unit 8
Mississauga ON  L5V 2P3
Canada
Phone: (905) 826-1164
Fax: (905) 826-1214
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Raman Tatla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 11 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Tatla ( CPSO# 103693)

Business Address:
Streetsville Medical Centre
8 - 5425 Creditview Road
Mississauga ON  L5V 2P3
Phone Number: (905) 826-1164

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
Department Of Family Medicine
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-3852

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAMAN KAUR TATLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TATLA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2016