Tatlay, Kiran Deep Kaur (CPSO#: 68877)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 100
2525 Roseville Garden Drive
Windsor ON  N8T 3J8
Phone: (519) 945-4474
Fax: (519) 944-1703
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kiran Tatlay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 06 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Tatlay ( CPSO# 68877 )

Business Address:
Suite 100
2525 Roseville Garden Drive
Windsor ON  N8T 3J8
Phone Number: (519) 945-4474

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIRAN DEEP KAUR TATLAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TATLAY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1997