Tatton, William George (CPSO#: 21127)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 14 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1978
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009