Tattum, Leah Eve (CPSO#: 73698)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northwestern University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3030 Lawrence Ave East
Suite 407
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone: (416) 431-5292
Fax: (416) 431-4011
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
Phone: (416) 438-2911
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tattum Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 11 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Tattum ( CPSO# 73698 )

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 725-7118

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEAH EVE TATTUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TATTUM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003