Taucer, Fabiano Antonio Stefano (CPSO#: 31559)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621 Ext. 4521
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

5929 Jeanne D'Arc Blvd
Unit 1924
Ottawa Cardiovascular Centre Orlean
Ottawa ON  K1C 6V8
Canada
Phone: 613 749 1242
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Suite 502
1355 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1H 8K7
Canada
Phone: (613) 738-8098
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F.A.S. Taucer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Taucer ( CPSO# 31559 )

Business Address:
502 - 1355 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1H 8K7
Phone Number: (613) 738-1584

Business Address:
1370 Clyde Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2G 3H8
Phone Number: (613) 513-5797

Business Address:
1924 - 5929 Jeanne D'Arc Boulevard
Ottawa ON  K1C 6V8
Phone Number: (613) 513-5797

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 23 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FABIANO ANTONIO STEFANO TAUCER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAUCER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1980