Taves, Jonathan Eric (CPSO#: 100370)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Aug 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 03 Aug 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Electoral District: 04

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Aug 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 16 Jun 2017 Active View Details [+]
            Practice Within the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (1)   Dr.  Jonathan  Eric  Taves  shall  practise  medicine  as required by the
                  postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. Taves  is enrolled at
                  McMaster University.

            (2)   In Dr. Taves' practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr.
                  Taves  shall  prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients  of  a
                  clinical teaching  unit  that  is formally affiliated with the department
                  where Dr. Taves is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate
                  trainees are regularly assigned  by the department as part of its program
                  of postgraduate medical education.

            (3)   In Dr. Taves' practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr.
                  Taves shall not charge a fee for medical services.

            Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (4)   Dr. Taves may practise adult critical  care medicine and to the extent of
                  his  employment  at   Hamilton Health Sciences  Corporation  while  under
                  supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.
                  
            (5)   In Dr. Taves' practice  specified  in  paragraph  (4),  Dr. Taves may not
                  charge a fee for medical services.

            Expiry of Certificate

            (6)   This  certificate of registration expires, and Dr. Taves  must  thereupon
                  cease all practice both in and outside the postgraduate medical education
                  program, on the earlier of the following times:

                  (a)   when  Dr.  Taves is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate
                        medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or
                  
                  (b)   when Dr. Taves  no  longer  holds  Canadian  citizenship, permanent
                        resident  status,  or  a valid employment authorization  under  the
                        Immigration Act (Canada).
                  
            Termination of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (7)   This  certificate  automatically   converts  to  a  regular  Postgraduate
                  Education certificate and Dr.  Taves  must immediately cease all practice
                  outside the postgraduate medical education  program  if  any  one  of the
                  following occurs:

                  (a)   the supervisor identified in paragraph (4) notifies the College  of
                        any  concerns  regarding  Dr.  Taves'  practice,  including but not
                        limited  to  concerns  regarding  knowledge,  skill,  judgment   or
                        attitude;
                  
                  (b)   the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue to
                        supervise Dr. Taves' practice;
                  
                  (c)   the Postgraduate Dean informs the College that the medical school's
                        approval   for  Dr.   Taves  to  engage  in  practice  outside  the
                        postgraduate medical education program has been withdrawn;
                  
                  (d)   when Dr. Taves' employment as specified in paragraph (4) ceases; or
                  
                  (e)   if Dr. Taves  takes  a  leave  of  absence, or transfers to another
                        program,  from  the  postgraduate education  program  specified  in
                        paragraph (1).
                  
            Resumption of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (8)   In  the  event  of  conversion  to   a   regular  Postgraduate  Education
                  certificate  under  paragraph  (7) or expiry  of  the  certificate  under
                  paragraph  (7),  Dr.  Taves  may not  resume  any  practice  outside  the
                  postgraduate medical education  program under the restricted registration
                  for residents policy until Dr. Taves  applies  for  a  new certificate of
                  registration and obtains approval by the Registration Committee.



            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on  August  3,  2016.  In accordance  with
                  paragraph  6(a), this certificate of registration  expires  on  June  30,
                  2018.  All practice must cease on that date.

                  Practice  outside   the   postgraduate  medical  education  program  must
                  immediately cease upon any of the events in paragraph 7.